B. et al v. Clarksville Montgomery County Schools System

Defendant: Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Plaintiff: P. B. and T. B.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01477
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiff's motion to ascertain status 13 is GRANTED. In accord with the order entered August 7, 2014 10 , a hearing is scheduled on Thursday, August 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., to establish briefing deadlines and deadlines for any discovery related to the preliminary injunction hearing, and propose a target date for the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/26/14.(dt)
August 28, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing deadlines, deadlines for any discovery related to the preliminary injunction hearing, and target dates for the preliminary injunction hearing. The initial case management conference scheduled on September 8, 2014 is CANCELED, and will be rescheduled after a ruling on the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 22, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/22/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al v. Clarksville Montgomery County Schools System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksville Montgomery County School System
Represented By: John D. Kitch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. B.
Represented By: Cheryl Lynne Cheffins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: Cheryl Lynne Cheffins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]