Flying J Inc et al v. TA Operating et al

 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00030
Filed: February 27, 2006
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Northern Office
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2008 420 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part 310 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 9/2/08 (alt)
May 18, 2009 616 Featured Case ORDER re 575 Discovery Hearing. The Court enters this order to mmorialize its rulings at the April 16, 2009 discovery hearing concerning certain of Plaintiffs' document requests to Comdata.Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on May 18, 2009. (DN)
June 25, 2009 689 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part 517 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 6/25/09 (alt)
June 25, 2009 690 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 578 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 6/25/09 (alt)
August 17, 2009 748 Featured Case ORDER granting 736 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case including current obligations to locate and produce additional documents and respond to interrogatories (including any discovery work or pending discovery obligations of any party) ar e stayed through at least Friday, October 30, 2009. Counsel for Flying J and Pilot shall file reports on the status of settlement no later than September 15, 2009, and October 9, 2009, and a status conference shall be held Thursday October 15, 2009, in Room 477, U. S. Courthouse, 350 South Main Street, Salt Lake City, Utah, to discuss with counsel the status of the settlement negotiations and the stay in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on August 17, 2009. (DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Flying J Inc et al v. TA Operating et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]