Petersen et al v. DaimlerChrysler et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00108
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Northern Office
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 369 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 350 Motion to Compel; granting 357 Motion for Extension of Deposition Times. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/29/10 (alt)
March 17, 2011 596 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 410 Motion for Spoliation Sanctions; denying 435 Motion to Amend Protective Order; denying 444 Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/17/11 (alt)
May 4, 2011 747 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 408 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 562 Motion in Limine re Adjustment Data. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/4/11 (alt)
June 22, 2011 769 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part as moot 532 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/22/11 (alt)
June 22, 2011 770 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 523 Motion to Admit Evidence of Wilcox Assignment. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/22/11 (alt)
June 30, 2011 776 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling 419 Objections; denying 484 Motion in Limine; denying 486 Motion in Limine; granting 559 Motion in Limine; granting 597 Motion to Compel; granting 657 Motion to Strike ; granting 666 Motion to Enforce; granting 685 Motion to Withdraw; overruling without prejudice 728 Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/30/11 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen et al v. DaimlerChrysler et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]