TL Crowther v. Rocky Mountain Pipeline System et al

Plaintiff: TL Crowther
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Pipeline System and Prairie Pipeline Contractors
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00141
Filed: November 21, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 100 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Denying Defendants' Rule 50 Motion. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/23/2011. (las)
May 31, 2011 123 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Alter Judgment. The jury's entry of $90,000 of punitive damages is hereby stricken as impermissibly duplicative. In addition, the Court finds the entry of prejudgment interest on the verdict unwarranted under Utah law. As to all other grounds, the Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/31/2011. (las)
May 20, 2010 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER:denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment ; finding as moot 42 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 05/20/2010. (kpf)
March 18, 2011 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 83 Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Duplicative Damages for the Value of Lost Trees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/18/2011. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TL Crowther v. Rocky Mountain Pipeline System et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TL Crowther
Represented By: Jackie Pilling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Pipeline System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Pipeline Contractors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]