Desai v. Panguitch Main St, et al

 
Case Number: 2:2004cv00691
Filed: September 9, 2004
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2010 105 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 89 Motion to change trial from a Jury Trial to a Bench; granting 90 Motion to change the trial from a Jury Trial to a Bench Trial; granting 93 Motion to Re-Open the case (removal from stay); denying 94 M otion to Appoint Counsel; granting 96 Motion to Quash Subpoena served on David L. Church. The Plaintiffs related requests are denied; denying 99 Motion to Compel the defendants to comply with the subpoena. The Court again instructs Plaintiff to i nclude the new requested relief when he files his amended complaint as discussed above; denying 101 Motion to Compel the defendants for their ambiguous positions, defense, arguments, claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 06/07/2010. (kpf)
February 11, 2011 116 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 106 Motion re: amending complaint, 107 Motion re: amending complain; granting 109 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint; granting 112 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint; denying 108 Motion to receive correspondence via fax; finding as moot 110 Motion to Change Amount; denying 113 Motion to reconsider; finding as moot 114 Motion to moot; denying 115 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/11/11 (alt)
December 14, 2011 134 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 118 Motion to Compel; denying 124 Motion to Compel; denying 125 Motion to Compel; denying 126 Motion to Produce; denying 127 Motion to Produce; denying 128 Motion to Compel; denying 129 M otion to Compel; denying 130 Motion to Compel; denying 131 Motion to Compel; denying 132 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion to Stay; Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2012 02:00 PM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/13/11 (alt)
November 8, 2012 191 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION finding as moot 139 Motion ; finding as moot 140 Motion for Protective Order; granting 153 Motion for Summary Judgment ; finding as moot 157 Motion ; finding as moot 167 Motion ; finding as moot [169 ] Motion ; finding as moot 177 Motion for Hearing; finding as moot 181 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 187 Motion to Quash. The final pretrial conference scheduled for November 14, 2012, and the three-day bench trial scheduled to begin on November 27, 2012, are hereby STRICKEN. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/8/12. (jlw)
January 8, 2009 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 66 Motion (1)Request to consider Administrative Court's decision which is yet to be received (as of 12/18/08), finding as MOOT (2)Request to initiate the trial in February/March of 2009 or hold the Trial's process until June/July 2009; denying 66 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/8/09. (jwt)
September 9, 2009 85 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 70 Motion to Replace Relief in Original Complaint (D. Request for Relief) filed by Plaintiff Harshad P. Desai; denying 71 Motion to Compel Defendants Not to Engage in Obstruction of Justice & Allow the Plain tiff to Access Public Records filed by Plaintiff Harshad P. Desa; denying 76 Motion 1) to recognize that the plaintiff is at Unfair disadvantage, 2) to order the defendant to stop practice of Obstruction of Justice; finding as moot 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - to extend the Discovery Cutoff date from 6/6/09 to 7/31/09 filed by Plaintiff Harshad P. Desai and plaintiff's request to amend the scheduling order is moot; denying 78 Motion to Consolidate Cases/new case into Existing case based on recent (1) ALJ's ruling and (2) nature of discrimination, same defendants, same plaintiff, etc. filed by Plaintiff Harshad P. Desai. The scheduling order in this matter is vacated and the pretrial conference and trial dates are stricken. The case is STAYED until plaintiff has exhausted his administrative remedies in the related administrative cases; denying 79 Motion to order the defendants to open the executive Sessions / closed door meetings (under Uta h Code 52-4-304) conducted in non-compliance / violation of Utah codes (52-4-202 thru 206) allow the plaintiff to access the records filed by Plaintiff Harshad P. Desai. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/8/09. (ce) Modified on 9/9/2009 to add clarifying text (ce).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Desai v. Panguitch Main St, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]