Sanders et al v. Ethington et al

Plaintiff: Scott Sanders and Lisa Sanders
Defendant: Bruce Ethington, Mountain America Credit Union, Integrated Title Services and First American
Case Number: 2:2010cv00183
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ; denying 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/15/2010. (asp)
July 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re the TILA claim. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/12/13 (alt)
November 4, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting 45 Defendant MACU's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 55 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case, each party to bear his, her, and its own costs. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/3/2014. (jds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. Ethington et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sanders
Represented By: Matthew G. Wadsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sanders
Represented By: Matthew G. Wadsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Ethington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain America Credit Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Title Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]