Zabriskie v. Marsh

Plaintiff: Richard S. Zabriskie
Defendant: Grant Marsh
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00676
Filed: July 19, 2010
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint: magistrate judge recommends that the complaint be dismissed with respect to claims brought pursuant to 18 USC 241, 245 and 42 USC 1983, 1985. As to Counts II and III brought pursuant to USC 3631, the Court recommends that within 14 days of the date of this report that plaintiff provide a more definite statement. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (alt)
December 13, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for More Definite Statement: Plaintiff's claims, with the exception of Counts II and III, are dismissed. 17 Motion to Dismiss is denied as premature. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/10/10 (alt)
March 11, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting 24 Motion to Dismiss, denying 31 Motion to Stay - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/11/11 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zabriskie v. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Zabriskie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]