Pig Boys v. All Star Catering et al

Defendant: Nicholas Firkins, All Star Catering and Richard Firkins
Plaintiff: Pig Boys
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00078
Filed: January 20, 2011
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Brooke C. Wells
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Pig Boys is therefore ORDERED to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Such a showing must be made within 10 days of the da te of this order. Alternatively, Pig Boys may move to amend the complaint or to voluntarily withdraw this action from the federal docket. Either of these options must also be exercised within 10 days of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/4/2011. (jtj)
October 11, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/11/11. (jmr)
December 5, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting 36 Motion Lift Stay As to Nicholas Firkins and All Star Catering filed by Plaintiff Pig Boys. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/5/11. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pig Boys v. All Star Catering et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Firkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Star Catering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Firkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pig Boys
Represented By: Jonathan Dale Bletzacker
Represented By: Stephen W. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]