Ashike et al v. Mullen Crane and Transport et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Ashike and Latanya Yazzie
Defendant: Mullen Crane and Transport and Brock Farnworth
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2012
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 119 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 85 Motion in Limine and For Sanctions AgainstDefendants for Lying in Discovery; denying 108 Motion in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Retained Experts to Opinions Contained in the Experts Reports or Depositions ; granting 109 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Roger Allen with Regard to the Utah Trucking Guide; granting in part and denying in part 110 Plaintiffs Affirmative Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/23/2014. (jds)
April 2, 2013 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/2/13. (jlw)
January 8, 2014 90 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 59 Motion to Strike. The reports of Dr. Stimac, Dr. King and portions cited in Defendants Motion to Strike of as too Dr. Biglers supplemental report are stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 1/8/14. (jlw)
January 27, 2014 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 57 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/27/14. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ashike et al v. Mullen Crane and Transport et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ashike
Represented By: Forrest G. Buffington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Yazzie
Represented By: Forrest G. Buffington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullen Crane and Transport
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Farnworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]