Lietzke v. County of Montgomery et al

Defendant: D. T. Marshall, State of Alabama Sheriffs Officers, Todd Strange, Kevin Murphy, Reese McKinney and County of Montgomery
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Case Number: 2:2012cv00268
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer (DJ)
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 11 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 08/06/2012. (asp)
February 20, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 8 Motion for Speedy Trial; finding as moot 8 Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner; denying 26 Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Furse; denying 27 Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Furse; denying 29 Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Furse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/19/13 (alt)
March 14, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; finding as m oot 5 Motion for Service of Process; finding as moot 26 Motion for Default Judgment - plaintiff's causes of action are dismissed without prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer referred on case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/14/13 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lietzke v. County of Montgomery et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Sheriffs Officers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Strange
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reese McKinney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]