Osborn et al v. Brown et al

Defendant: Utah Litigation Counselors, JL Martin Law Group, Century Law, Wilford T. Lee, WT Lee and Associates, John McCall, Chad Gettel, Kasey Rasmussen, Charles Craig Brown, CC Brown Law, Sentry Law and LegalSupportline.com
Plaintiff: Jared Osborn and Vanessa Osborn
Case Number: 2:2012cv00775
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel re John McCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/19/13 (alt)
April 25, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 91 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 92 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 99 Motion to Expedite; modifying 85 Order - Plaintiff has until 5/15/13 to file motion to amend. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/25/13 (alt)
May 1, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 83 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/1/13 (alt)
May 8, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 119 Motion for Joinder, denying as moot 118 Motion for Leave to File. Claims against the Lee Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs will now have until 5/29/13 to file a motion to amend. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/8/13 (alt)
February 12, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 51 Motion to Stay ; denying 51 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/11/13 (alt)
April 8, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: The first cause of action (wire fraud) and the second cause of action (bank fraud) are dismissed with prejudice; The claims against Mr. McCall and Mr. Gettel are dismissed without prejudice; plaintiffs may file a motion to amend complaint by 5/1/13. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/8/13 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn et al v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Litigation Counselors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Martin Law Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Law
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilford T. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT Lee and Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Gettel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey Rasmussen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Craig Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC Brown Law
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Law
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LegalSupportline.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Osborn
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Osborn
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]