Roundy et al v. Wells Fargo Bank

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Tiffany Farley Roundy and Brady Burke Roundy
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01032
Filed: November 5, 2012
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Referring Judge: Dustin B. Pead
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; finding as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiffs must file their first amended complaint no later than 10 days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs may then either (1) file a substantive response to the motion to dismiss the first amended complaint, or (2) file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/9/13 (alt)
October 7, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to granting 36 Motion to Withdraw 28 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/7/13 (alt)
November 5, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 29 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the second amended complaint no later than 10 days after entry of this order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/5/13 (alt)
September 10, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/10/14 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roundy et al v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Amber M. Mettler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Farley Roundy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Burke Roundy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]