Broussard v. United States Army Medical Command

Plaintiff: Dwight Ole Broussard
Defendant: United States Army Medical Command
Case Number: 2:2013cv00054
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 16 Motion for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 04/02/2014. (tls)
December 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 26 Motion for Default Judgment. Mr. Broussard may file an opposition, if any, to the United States' Motion to Dismiss within 28 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/29/2014. (las)
March 10, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 Report and Recommendations. granting 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; denying 34 Motion to Continue. Mr. Broussard's claims are dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/10/2015. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. United States Army Medical Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Ole Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Medical Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.