Mitochon Practice Management Systems v. Healthcare Technology Alliance et al

Plaintiff: Mitochon Practice Management Systems
Defendant: Healthcare Technology Alliance, Richard J. Nielsen, RJ Nielsen Family Partnership, Akamai Practice Management, Medtrak Data Systems, Valli Information Systems, Robert Putnam, Mark Service and Robert Jenkins
Case Number: 2:2013cv00177
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/4/13 (alt)
November 4, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/4/13 (alt)
July 21, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 63 Motion to Withdraw and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/21/2014. (jds)
March 23, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because this decisiondisposes of all the remaining claims in the case, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/23/2015. (jds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitochon Practice Management Systems v. Healthcare Technology Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitochon Practice Management Systems
Represented By: Eric J. Hardeman
Represented By: Marc T. Rasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Technology Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ Nielsen Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akamai Practice Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtrak Data Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valli Information Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.