Anderson v. Herbert et al

Defendant: Gary R. Herbert, Michael Ackerlow, Michael Gallegos and Road Home Shelter, The
Plaintiff: Michael T. Anderson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00211
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; finding as moot 51 Motion to Strike ; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 84 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/1/2014. (las)
January 30, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 32 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 01/30/2014. (tls)
June 27, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The court grants in part and denies in part 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Develop Additional Claims and Evidence Prior to Filing His Third Amended Complaint, and Overrules the Plaintiff's O bjections to the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. The court Further Orders that Mr. Anderson file a response to the Motions to dismiss and motion to strike, if he elects to do so, within forty-five days of the date of this Order. If Mr. Anderson files a motion to amend pleading, it will not toll or delay the deadline for filing a response, if any, to outstanding motions to dismiss.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/27/2014. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Herbert et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Represented By: Meb W. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ackerlow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gallegos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Home Shelter, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]