State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00223
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8-1-14. (sih)
January 13, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Because this decision disposes of all the claims at issue in the case, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close the case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/13/2015. (jds)
January 14, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This Amended Memorandum Decision and Order replaces the Memorandum Decision and Order issued by the court on January 13, 2015. The only purpose for the Amendment is to correct a typographical error on Page 12 of that Order. The last sentence in the equitable estoppel section erroneously stated that it was State Farm's motion for summary judgment. That sentence now reads: Accordingly, the court grants COP's motion for summary judgment on State Farm's equitable estoppel claim. No other changes have been made to the prior Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 01/14/2015. (sih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard A. Vazquez
Represented By: John R. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.