Harris v. Paragon Contractors et al

Petitioner: Seth Harris
Respondent: Paragon Contractors, Brian Jessop and Dale Barlow
 
Case Number: 2:2013mc00281
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion to Compel
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Addressing Vergel Steed's Motion to Sustain Objections(Doc. #73)-granting 73 Motion ; rejecting 115 Report and Recommendations.; Motions terminated: 115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 73 MOTION Sustain Objections to Department's Inquiries Regarding Internal Affairs of FLDS Church and Memorandum in Support filed by Vergel Steed., 73 MOTION to Sustain Objections to Department's Inquiries Regarding Internal Affairs of FLDS Church filed by Vergel Steed. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David Sam on 9/11/14. (jmr)
September 11, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Addressing Motions to Enforce Subpeona Against Dale Barlow (Doc. #46 and #103)-granting 103 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 117 Report and Recommendations. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge David Sam on 9/11/14. (jmr)
July 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re 19 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 07/12/2013. (tls)
August 21, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 2 Motion to Compel ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 21 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/21/2013. (asp)
November 22, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 32 Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re 33 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/22/2013. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harris v. Paragon Contractors et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Seth Harris
Represented By: Lydia Tzagoloff
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Represented By: Karen E. Bobela
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paragon Contractors
Represented By: Rick J Sutherland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Jessop
Represented By: Rick J Sutherland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dale Barlow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]