Cafferky v. Pallito

Plaintiff: Christopher J. Cafferky
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00193
Filed: August 21, 2009
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Caledonia
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING Magistrate Judge's 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : 10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Christopher J. Cafferky is DENIED. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge John M. Conroy for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 4/2/2010. (kak)
July 29, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming, Approving and Adopting 19 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Dft's 9 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Pltf shall be allowed 30 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint on or before 8/30/2010 will result in the dismissal of this case with prejudice. Pltf's 11 Motion for Injunction on the Dept of Corrections, construed as a motion for release from state custody, is DENIED. It is further certified that any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such and appeal would be frivolous. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/29/2010.
March 29, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 30 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Any claim against Defendant Bracaccio relating to pltf's parole violation is DISMISSED without prejudice. Any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. Signed by Senior Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/29/2011. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cafferky v. Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Cafferky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]