Bourn v. Gauthier et al

Plaintiff: Paul Bourn
Defendant: Richard Gauthier, Officer Dean, Officer Stemp, Officer Faden and Bennington Police Department
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00212
Filed: September 14, 2009
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Bennington
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2010 29 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Deft Bennington Police Department's 7 motion to dismiss is GRANTED and all claims against it are DISMISSED. Bourn's 9 , 22 and 26 motions to amend his complaint are DENIED without prejudice. Finally, Bourn's 16 motion for production/preservation of all relevant evidence and 20 , 28 motions for appointment of counsel are DENIED. Denial of the motions for appointment of counsel is without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/3/2010. (wjf)
September 14, 2009 2 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 9/14/2009. (kak)
March 29, 2011 34 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before 4/28/2011. Failure to file a timely Amended Complaint will result in the dismissal of all claims with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/29/2011. (kak)
June 25, 2012 50 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss. The proposed schedule shall be filed by 7/27/2012. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/25/2012. (wjf)
March 27, 2013 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is DISMISSED. Any appeal would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/27/2013. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bourn v. Gauthier et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bourn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gauthier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stemp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Faden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennington Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]