Moran v. Pallito

Plaintiff: Leo Moran
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Case Number: 1:2009cv00227
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming, Approving and Adopting 11 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation re 7 Motion to Dismiss. Dft's 7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall be allowed 30 days from the date of this Order to file and amended complaint. Failure to file a properly amended complaint on or before 6/28/2010 will result in the dismissal of this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/28/2010. (kak)
December 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Defendant's 15 MOTION to Dismiss be granted and that this case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 1/13/2011. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/27/2010. (hbc)
January 25, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Granting unopposed 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Andrew Pallito. This case is DISMISSED. It is further certified that any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 01/25/2011. (wjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Moran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]