Hall v. Sorrell

Petitioner: Victor G. Hall
Respondent: William H. Sorrell
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00291
Filed: December 22, 2009
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Chittenden
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 19 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: recommending that plaintiff's 12 EMERGENCY MOTION for Protective Order, 13 MOTION for Default Judgment be denied. ORDERED: plaintiff's 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice, and 18 MOTION to Stay pending appointment of counsel is DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 3/3/10. (hbc) (Main Document replaced on 3/4/2010) (jlh).
March 26, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 19 Magistrate Judge's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 12 Motion for Protective Order and 13 Motion for Default Judgment are DENIED. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge John M. Conroy for further proceedings. It is further certified that any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/26/2010. (kak)
April 28, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER AFFRIMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 24 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation for 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), and 15 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED: 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus DENIED. 15 MOTION to Dis miss without Prejudice GRANTED. The Court denies petitioner a certificate of appealability because the petitioner failed to make a substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right. It is further certified that any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 4/28/2010. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hall v. Sorrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor G. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William H. Sorrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]