Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC et al v. Shumlin et al

Amicus: Vermont Public Interest Research Group, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 300, New England Coalition, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation and Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Plaintiff: Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.
Defendant: Peter Shumlin, William Sorrell, James Volz, John Burke and David Coen
Case Number: 1:2011cv00099
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:2011
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony Expressing Legal Conclusions. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 8/25/2011. (kak)
January 19, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON THE MERITS OF THE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 1/19/2012. (kak)
January 9, 2013 223 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 213 Expedited Motion for an Injunction Requiring the New England Coalition to Withdraw It's Complaint Seeking Immediate Shutdown of the Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Station. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 1/9/2013. (kak)
May 17, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: denying New England Coalition, Inc.'s 21 Motion to Intervene. New England Coalition, Inc. may file, on or before 5/31/2011, a Motion for Leave of Court to File as Amicus Curiae a memorandum of law supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' pending 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/17/2011. (wjf)
June 2, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Intervene by The Conservation Law Foundation and Vermont Public Interest Research Group as party defendants. CLF and VPIRG were granted leave to move to file an amicus memorandum in advance of the hearing on Plaintiffs� 39; Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. For the remainder of the case, where the Court requires briefing, CLF and VPIRG may continue to file, no later than seven days after the supported party files its principal memorandum, a motion for leave of court to file as amicus curiae a joint memorandum of law. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/2/2011. (wjf)
July 18, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/18/2011. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC et al v. Shumlin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Vermont Public Interest Research Group
Represented By: Anthony Nicholas L. Iarrapino
Represented By: Christopher M. Kilian
Represented By: Sandra E. Levine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 300
Represented By: Aaron D Krakow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New England Coalition, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Anthony Nicholas L. Iarrapino
Represented By: Christopher M. Kilian
Represented By: Sandra E. Levine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Carol Iancu
Represented By: Kenneth W. Salinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC
Represented By: Sanford I. Weisburst, Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Juman, Esq.
Represented By: Robert B. Hemley
Represented By: Faith E. Gay, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne
Represented By: William B. Adams, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne
Represented By: William B. Adams, Esq.
Represented By: Faith E. Gay, Esq.
Represented By: Robert B. Hemley
Represented By: Robert C. Juman, Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Sanford I. Weisburst, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Shumlin
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio
Represented By: Scot L. Kline, Esq.
Represented By: Kyle H. Landis-Marinello, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sorrell
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio
Represented By: Scot L. Kline, Esq.
Represented By: Kyle H. Landis-Marinello, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Volz
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio
Represented By: Scot L. Kline, Esq.
Represented By: Kyle H. Landis-Marinello, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burke
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio
Represented By: Scot L. Kline, Esq.
Represented By: Kyle H. Landis-Marinello, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Coen
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio
Represented By: Scot L. Kline, Esq.
Represented By: Kyle H. Landis-Marinello, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]