Vaughan v. Vermont Law School, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Vaughan
Defendant: Vermont Law School, Inc., Shirley Jefferson and Rachel Herbst
Case Number: 2:2010cv00276
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: granting 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum and Order ruling upon 7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to State a Claim. Upon reconsideration, 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to State a Claim with respect to the NIED claim is granted. The NIED claim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/22/2011. (law)
August 4, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Leave to Amend 1 Complaint and Join Additional Party; denying 62 Motion to Preclude the Re-trial of Whether RH "Consented", MOTION to Preserve Confidentiality of Deposition Excerpt; denying 63 Motion to Seal; denying 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline for Expert Disclosure & Other Dates and 74 Revision to 71 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline for Expert Disclosure & Other Dates ; granting 74 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/4/2011. (law)
September 12, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 85 Motion to Reconsider or Clarify re 82 Memorandum and Order, or in alternative, Motion to Certify Issues for the Vermont Supreme Court and/or to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/12/2011. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Vermont Law School, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Vaughan
Represented By: W. E. Whittington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Law School, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Jefferson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Herbst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]