Gabriel v. Albany College of Pharmacy and Health Sciences - Vermont Campus (ACPHS) et al

Defendant: Jason Long, Melissa Long, James J. Gozzo, John Denio, Peter J. Cornish, Gail Goodman Snitkoff, Gerald Katzman, Accreditation Council of Pharmacy Education (ACPE), Peter H. Vlasses, Ronald A. DeBellis, Robert Hamilton, Joanna Schwartz, Stefan Balaz, Lindsay M. Antikainen, Albany College of Pharmacy and Health Sciences - Vermont Campus (ACPHS) and Dorothy Pumo
Plaintiff: Matthew Gabriel
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00014
Filed: January 20, 2012
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2012 51 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; granting 47 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss. Gabriel's breach of contract claims against Defendants are DISMISSED. Gabriel may file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/3/2012. (law)
August 16, 2013 70 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/16/2013. (jam)
January 15, 2014 96 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 94 Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/15/2014. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gabriel v. Albany College of Pharmacy and Health Sciences - Vermont Campus (ACPHS) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Long
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Long
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Gozzo
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Denio
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Cornish
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Goodman Snitkoff
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Katzman
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accreditation Council of Pharmacy Education (ACPE)
Represented By: John D. Monahan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Vlasses
Represented By: John D. Monahan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. DeBellis
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hamilton
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Schwartz
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Balaz
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay M. Antikainen
Represented By: John D. Monahan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany College of Pharmacy and Health Sciences - Vermont Campus (ACPHS)
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Pumo
Represented By: Paul Schor, Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Gallagher, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gabriel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]