Jenkins v. Miller et al

Defendant: Christian Aid Ministries, Inc., Response Unlimited, Inc., Andrew Yoder, Thomas Road Baptist Church, Inc., Douglas Wright, Victoria Hyden, Liberty University School of Law, Linda M. Wall, Philip Zodhiates, Kenneth L. Miller, Lisa Ann Miller and Timothy D. Miller
Plaintiff: Janet Jenkins
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00184
Filed: August 14, 2012
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: Rutland
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Defendant Douglas Wright's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is granted (defendant Wright is dismissed from case and Count Five of the Amended Complaint is dismissed)); Defendant Andrew Y oder's 62 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is granted (defendant Yoder is dismissed from case); Defendant Christian Aid Ministries, Inc. 63 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief C an be Granted and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is granted for lack of personal jurisdiction (defendant Christian Aid Ministries is dismissed from case); Defendant Kenneth Miller's 56 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternativ e, 56 Motion to Change Venue is granted in part and denied in part; Defendant Linda M. Wall's 109 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted is granted in p art and denying in part; Defendants Liberty University, Inc., Thomas Road Baptist Church, Inc. and Victoria Hydens' 66 Re-filed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue and Failure to State a Claim is granted in part and denied in part (defendants Liberty University and Thomas Road Baptist Church, Inc. are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction); Counts Two and Three are dismissed against all defendants for failure to state claim; Count Four is dismissed with leave to move to amend within 60 days; Defendants Philip Zodhiates and Response Unlimited, Inc.'s 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue are denied in part and denied in part as premature (plaintiff shall have 60 days to conduct jurisdictional discovery with respect to Response Unlimited, Inc.); Defendants Liberty University, Inc., Thomas Road Baptist Church, Inc. and Victoria Hyden's 67 Motion to Change Venue is denied. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/24/2013. (law)
October 25, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 115 Opinion and Order. The document image has been replaced to correct typographical errors. The corrected image is now attached to 115 and is also attached to this entry. (law)
July 15, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 142 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 143 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/15/2014. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jenkins v. Miller et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Aid Ministries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Response Unlimited, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Yoder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Road Baptist Church, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Hyden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty University School of Law
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Wall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Zodhiates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Miller
Represented By: Joshua M. Autry, Esq.
Represented By: Brooks G. McArthur, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ann Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jenkins
Represented By: Sarah Star, Esq.
Represented By: Frank H. Langrock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]