Burke v. Pallito

Petitioner: James T. Burke
Respondent: Andy Pallito
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00197
Filed: August 28, 2012
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 8 Motion to Dismiss and petitioner's unexhausted ineffective assistance of counsel claim is deleted from the pending petition; denying without prejudice 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 20 Motion for Default Judgment. The court orders the respondent to answer the petition within 60 days from the date of this order. A certificate of appealability is DENI ED because the petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of denial of a federal right. It is certified that any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/8/2013. (law)
March 14, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 23 Second Amended Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/13/2013. (law)
November 21, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: denying 30 Renewed Motion to Dismiss; denying 4 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. A certificate of appeal ability is DENIED because the petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of denial of a federal right. Furthermore, it is certified that any appeal taken in forma pauperis would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/20/2013. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burke v. Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James T. Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andy Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]