Coon v. Southwestern Vermont Medical Center et al

Defendant: Shea Family Funeral Homes and Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Plaintiff: Donald J. Coon
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00182
Filed: June 25, 2013
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 105 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law is DENIED and 116 MOTION for Court to Reassess is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/16/2014. (hbc)
July 30, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by NBT Bankcorp; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 132 MOTION to Compel NBT Bank to Answer Subpoena; denying 132 MOTION for Hearing. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/30/2014. (hbc)
August 7, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 144 MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions and 147 MOTION to Strike are DENIED. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/7/2014. (hbc)
September 30, 2014 212 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 152 MOTION to Enjoin Plaintiff From Filing Further Vexatious Litigation Without Permission From the Court. Plaintiff is HEREBY ENJOINED from filing any further actions in this Court without obtaining prior leave from the Court. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 9/30/2014. (hbc)
January 30, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: 62 MOTION to Strike and 70 MOTION to Gain All Records of JMH are DENIED; 7 , 29 , and 49 MOTIONS to Dismiss and alternative MOTIONS for Summary Judgment are GRANTED; 9 and 37 MOTIONS to Dismiss and alternative MOTIONS for Summary Judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/30/2014. (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coon v. Southwestern Vermont Medical Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea Family Funeral Homes
Represented By: Ryan B. Gardner
Represented By: Richard H. Wadhams, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Vermont Medical Center
Represented By: Martha M. Smyrski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Coon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]