Schulman et al v. Saloon Beverage, Inc. et al

Defendant: Saloon Beverage, Inc., DWH I, LLC and Susan Schulze-Claasen
Plaintiff: Susan Schulman and Norman H. Schulman
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00193
Filed: July 3, 2013
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 52 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/14/2014. (hbc)
April 18, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs' 55 MOTION for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 4/18/2014. (hbc)
May 12, 2014 81 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 62 MOTION for Setoff is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' 77 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 5/12/2014. (hbc)
July 9, 2014 95 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and 82 Motion in Limine to Exclude Statements by Mark Clarke. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/9/2014. Any deposition of Eule or Clarke shall be completed within 30 days. (hbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schulman et al v. Saloon Beverage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saloon Beverage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWH I, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Schulze-Claasen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schulman
Represented By: Michael J. Regan, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman H. Schulman
Represented By: Michael J. Regan, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]