Antonio v. Pedersen et al

Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mark R. Pedersen and Mount Snow Ltd.
Thirdparty_defendant: Andrea Mitchell
Defendant: Mark R. Pedersen and Mount Snow Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00041
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Rutland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaints . Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 11/10/2011. (pam)
September 20, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 59 Counterclaimants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 9/20/2012. (pam)
December 11, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 73 Mount Snow's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 12/12/2012. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio v. Pedersen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mark R. Pedersen
Represented By: Richard J. Windish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mount Snow Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas P. Aicher, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Andrea Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Pedersen
Represented By: Richard J. Windish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Snow Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas P. Aicher, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]