The Thompsons Film LLC v. Does 1-35

Plaintiff: The Thompsons Film LLC
Defendant: Does 1-35
Case Number: 2:2013cv00126
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Lonny R. Suko
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 100 JOINT MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT RE 82 CLERK'S ORDER OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
April 24, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered against Defendant Wayne Long. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
September 3, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITH LEAVE TO RENEW PLAINTIFF'S 108 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgments and Permanent Injunctions Against Defendants Hayes, Kappen, Maxwell, and Urena (ECF No. 108) is DENIED with leave to renew. Plaintiff is directed to submit a memorandum and evidence in support of its claims against each defaulting Defendant and in support of its request for damages on or before 10/6/2014. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
October 31, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS. Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunctions Against Defendants Hayes, Kappen, Maxwell, and Urena ECF No. 115 is GRANTED.Judgment shall be entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) for Plaintiff against each of these defaulted Defendants. The file shall remain OPEN to address the remaining parties' contentions. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 31, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff The Thompsons Film LLC and against Defendant Ross Kappen. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 31, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff The Thompsons Film LLC and against Defendant Vikki Maxwell. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 31, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff The Thompsons Film LLC and against Defendant Anthony Hayes. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 31, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff The Thompsons Film LLC and against Defendant Juan Urena. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
March 12, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Set Aside Default, re 86 Clerk's Order Re Default. The default entered against Defendant Wickenhagen on December 9, 2013 (ECF No. 86) is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Wickenhagen are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and without fees or costs to either party. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Thompsons Film LLC v. Does 1-35
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Thompsons Film LLC
Represented By: Maureen Callahan VanderMay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-35
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]