Elmore v. Uttecht

Petitioner: Clark Elmore
Respondent: Jeff Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2008cv00053
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition no later than 60 days after the Washington Supreme Court denies Elmore's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN, )
July 30, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Provide Relevant Records, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 18, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1 Stay of Execution for Petitioner Clark Elmore, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN, )
April 20, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time; Petitioner has until 5/17/11 to file a Memorandum; signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(DN)
November 2, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 21, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Petition for Habeas Corpus by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
August 3, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Amend Judgment, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore v. Uttecht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clark Elmore
Represented By: Jeffrey Erwin Ellis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Uttecht
Represented By: Gregory J Rosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]