Washington Shoe Company v. A-Z Sporting Goods Inc

Plaintiff: Washington Shoe Company
Defendant: A-Z Sporting Goods Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv01042
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Dkt. # 121 ) is renoted for April 5, 2013, responsedeadline 3/27/2013. (CL)
March 14, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff's Motion for Taxable Costs (Dkt. # 120 ) is renoted for April 5, 2013, response ddl 3/27/2013. (CL)
August 12, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 121 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
October 7, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Order to Show Cause (Dkt. # 17 ) is hereby VACATED.(CL)
July 19, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 9 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 27, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL for lack of personal jurisdiction by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Shoe Company v. A-Z Sporting Goods Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Shoe Company
Represented By: Timothy B McCormack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Z Sporting Goods Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]