Cockburn v. SMS Industries, Inc. dba McGill Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Susan T. Cockburn
Defendant: SMS Industries, Inc. dba McGill Inc. and A.C. Moore Arts & Crafts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01566
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part Pltf's 78 Motion to Compel and Award Sanctions by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Deft is ORDERED to respond to Pltf's Request for Production within 21 days of the date of this Order. Also, Pltf is entitled to her reasonable expenses in bringing her motion. (TF)
April 5, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; The Court will allow Pltf three days from the date of this Order to move the Court to allow Dkt. # 97 to remain under seal. (TF)
May 4, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting deft CreateForLess, LLC's 39 Motion for Leave to File Declaration by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(TF)
June 8, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - For all of the foregoing reasons, defendants motion to dismiss (Dkt. #31) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. CreateForLess, LLCs motion to dismiss (Dkt. #35) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against Archivers, Moore, CreateForLess, LLC, and Notions are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockburn v. SMS Industries, Inc. dba McGill Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan T. Cockburn
Represented By: Douglas S Dunham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Industries, Inc. dba McGill Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Moore Arts & Crafts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]