REC Software USA, Inc. v. Bamboo Solutions Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
REC Software USA, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Bamboo Solutions Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, SAP America, Inc. and SAP, AG |
Counter_claimant: |
Microsoft Corporation, SAP, AG and SAP America, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
REC Software USA, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00554 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
James L. Robart |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
416
ORDER denying 404 Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to compel, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
319
ORDER denying 188 Microsoft's motion for summary judgment, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
290
ORDER - the court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Microsofts motion (Dkt. ## 201 202 ) to strike portions of RECs 1st Levine Report. The court GRANTS Microsofts request to serve a supplemental expert report on invalidity limited to addressing RECs theory of infringement for the second multi-module program limitation. Microsoft shall serve any supplemental expert report no later than September 1, 2012. The court DENIES all other requests in Microsofts motion, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing
281
ORDER denying 168 Plaintiff's Motion to strike portions of Microsoft's Kogan Report, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
159
ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: REC Software USA, Inc. v. Bamboo Solutions Corporation et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: REC Software USA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nichole Buck Vanderslice |
Represented By: |
Jofrey M McWilliam |
Represented By: |
Richard Elgar Lyon, III |
Represented By: |
David Brendan Lacy |
Represented By: |
Bradley S Keller |
Represented By: |
Rowland Braxton Hill, IV |
Represented By: |
Gregory Scott Dovel |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bamboo Solutions Corporation |
Represented By: |
Amy Lynn Brown |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation |
Represented By: |
Ruffin B Cordell |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kelly Catherine Hunsaker |
Represented By: |
Katherine K Lutton |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Represented By: |
Christopher T Wion |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: SAP America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ruffin B Cordell |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Kelly Catherine Hunsaker |
Represented By: |
Katherine K Lutton |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: SAP, AG |
Represented By: |
Ruffin B Cordell |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Kelly Catherine Hunsaker |
Represented By: |
Katherine K Lutton |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Represented By: |
Christopher T Wion |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: SAP, AG |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: SAP America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Shane P. Cramer |
Represented By: |
Joshua Pond |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: REC Software USA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gregory Scott Dovel |
Represented By: |
Rowland Braxton Hill, IV |
Represented By: |
David Brendan Lacy |
Represented By: |
Richard Elgar Lyon, III |
Represented By: |
Nichole Buck Vanderslice |
Represented By: |
Gregory Scott Dovel |
Represented By: |
Rowland Braxton Hill, IV |
Represented By: |
David Brendan Lacy |
Represented By: |
Richard Elgar Lyon, III |
Represented By: |
Nichole Buck Vanderslice |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?