Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Counter_defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00595
Filed: April 4, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 82 NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Kevin J. Post. Filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Post, Kevin) Address updated on 8/2/2012 (KN). Modified Address on 8/3/2012 (DS).
July 17, 2012 81 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO ENTER A STATISTICAL TERMINATION by Judge James L. Robart, United States District Judge; The parties may move to reopen this action at any time. (TF)
July 16, 2012 80 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY ALL PENDING PATENT-INFRINGEMENT RELATED CASES AND CLAIMS BETWEEN THE PLAINTIFF MICROSOFT AND DEFENDANTS MOTOROLA, ET AL by Judge James L. Robart. (docket number 355 in case number CV10-1823 JLR)(TF)
June 4, 2012 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Other Affiliate Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
June 4, 2012 78 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10. Filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Palumbo, Ralph)
May 24, 2012 77 Featured Case ORDER re 76 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicole Jantzi for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 24, 2012 76 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicole Jantzi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2825731. (McCune, Philip)
April 5, 2012 75 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2012, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/21/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2012, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
September 7, 2011 74 Featured Case ORDER re 71 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Josef B. Schenker for Motorola Mobility, Inc., and for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 73 Featured Case ORDER re 70 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin J. Post for Motorola Mobility, Inc., and for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER re 69 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Khue V. Hoang for Motorola Mobility, Inc., and for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 6, 2011 71 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josef B. Schenker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Receipt No. 0981-2545416. (McCune, Philip)
September 5, 2011 70 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin J. Post FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545415. (McCune, Philip)
September 5, 2011 69 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Khue V. Hoang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545414. (McCune, Philip)
July 25, 2011 68 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 8-10.. (McCune, Philip)
May 26, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/11/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/25/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
May 11, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour; The Court REASSIGNS this matter to the Honorable James L Robart for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the new case number C11-0595-JLR. (TF)
May 6, 2011 65 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge John C Coughenour for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case (AE)
May 3, 2011 64 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by parties. (McCune, Philip)
April 18, 2011 63 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/16/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/23/2011, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (JT)
April 14, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS David T Pritikin for dft Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(JT)
April 14, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER re 57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS John W McBride for dft Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(JT)
April 14, 2011 60 Featured Case ORDER re 56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Douglas I. Lewis for dft Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(JT)
April 14, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER re 55 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Richard A Cederoth for dft Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 14, 2011 58 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David T. Pritikin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2396660. (Cramer, Shane)
April 14, 2011 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John W. McBride FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2396654. (Cramer, Shane)
April 14, 2011 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Douglas I. Lewis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2396649. (Cramer, Shane)
April 14, 2011 55 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard A. Cederoth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2396640. (Cramer, Shane)
April 13, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER re 49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Steven Pepe for pltf Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 13, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER re 48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Jesse J. Jenner for pltf Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 13, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER re 47 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Gabrielle Higgins for pltf Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 13, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER re 46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Norman H. Beamer for pltf Motorola Mobility Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 13, 2011 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shane P. Cramer on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Cramer, Shane)
April 12, 2011 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven Pepe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2395057. (McCune, Philip)
April 12, 2011 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jesse J. Jenner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2395056. (McCune, Philip)
April 12, 2011 47 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gabrielle E. Higgins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2395055. (McCune, Philip)
April 12, 2011 46 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Norman H. Beamer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2395054. (McCune, Philip)
April 8, 2011 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip S McCune on behalf of Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (McCune, Philip)
April 8, 2011 44 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 5/20/2011. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (PM)
April 8, 2011 43 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the Western District of Wisconsin (Madison) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (PM)
April 8, 2011 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (PM)
April 8, 2011 42 Case transferred in from the Western District of Wisconsin (Madison), Case Number 3:10-cv-00826-bbc;. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2011: # 2 Email notification of transfer case) (PM).
April 1, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Transfer to Western District of Washington. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/11. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 28, 2011 40 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 8, 2011 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Nester Kass for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 3, 2011 38 Defendant Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint) for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A: 276 Patent, # 2 Exhibit Ex B: 718 Patent, # 3 Exhibit Ex C: 664 Patent, # 4 Exhibit Ex D: 666 Patent, # 5 Exhibit Ex E: 642 Patent) (Scheller, John) Modified docket text on 3/4/2011 (mmo/p). [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 3, 2011 37 Brief in Reply by Defendant Microsoft Corporation in Support of 10 Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Feb. 18, 2011 Opinion and Order) (Scheller, John) Modified exhibit description on 3/3/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 3, 2011 36 Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 3/18/2011. Motions Requesting Claims Construction due 8/12/2011. Claims Construction Response Brief due 9/2/2011. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/9/2011 at 09:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due 12/19/2011. Settlement Letters due 6/25/2012. Motions in Limine due 7/6/2012. Responses to Motions in Limine due 7/20/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2012 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/6/2012 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/2/11. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 2, 2011 35 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, and Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/2/11. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
March 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2011 [:10] (skv) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 25, 2011 34 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 24, 2011 33 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 24, 2011 32 Declaration of Kevin J. Post filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google Map - Buffalo Grove, # 2 Exhibit B - Google Map - Spring Grove, # 3 Exhibit C - Google Map - Winthrop Harbor, # 4 Exhibit D - Prime Sense re Xbox 360, # 5 Exhibit E - Prime Sense re Locations, # 6 Exhibit F - Xbox Hardware Jobs List, # 7 Exhibit G - Lex Machina Report - W.D. Wis., # 8 Exhibit H - Lex Machina Report - W.D. Wash.) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified exhibit letters on 2/25/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 24, 2011 31 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 30 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 29 Declaration of Anthony Pastor filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 28 Declaration of Steven Pepe filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 27 Declaration of Jesse J. Jenner filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 26 Declaration of Norman H. Beamer filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 25 Declaration of Gabrielle E. Higgins filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. re: 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 23, 2011 24 Motion to Admit Jesse J. Jenner, Steven Pepe, Norman H. Beamer, Gabrielle E. Higgins, Anthony Pastor Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 22, 2011 23 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 2/24/2011. Brief in Reply due 3/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/11. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 18, 2011 22 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 18, 2011 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (2 Day Extension Requested) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 2/25/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 15, 2011 20 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 14, 2011 19 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 14, 2011 18 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 14, 2011 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent No. 6,992,580, # 2 Exhibit Patent No. 7,106,358, # 3 Exhibit Patent No. 6,686,931, # 4 Exhibit Patent No. 7,008,220, # 5 Exhibit Patent No. 5,738,583, # 6 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 10, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/10/11. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 8, 2011 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
February 7, 2011 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 31, 2011 13 Declaration of Robert D. Leighton filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re: 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint from Microsoft Corp. v. Motorola; No. 2:10-cv-01577 (W.D. Wash. Oct. 1, 2010), # 2 Exhibit 2 - 10/21/10 letter from Daily to Gutierrez, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 10/29/10 letter Daily to Gutierrez, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Motorola Brief in Apple Inc. v. Motorola, Inc., No. 3:10-cv-662 (W.D. Wis. Dec. 23, 2010)) (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 31, 2011 12 Declaration of Kevin McCarthy filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re: 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 31, 2011 11 Brief in Support by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re: 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 31, 2011 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Western District of Washington by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 2/22/2011. Brief in Reply due 3/3/2011. (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 21, 2011 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset from 2/25/11 at 9:00 AM to 3/2/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker to accommodate the court's schedule. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 20, 2011 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (krj) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 19, 2011 9 Notice of Appearance of Christopher C. Davis filed by Christopher C. Davis for Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Davis, Christopher) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 19, 2011 8 Notice of Appearance of John C. Scheller filed by John Scheller for Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation, Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Scheller, John) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 19, 2011 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 6,374,276 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - US 7,454,718 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - US 6,822,664 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - US 7,421,666 Patent, # 5 Exhibit E - US 6,256,642 Patent) (Best, J.) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 5, 2011 Case non-randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related to 10-cv-700. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
January 4, 2011 6 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Microsoft Corporation served on 12/29/2010, answer due 1/19/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 28, 2010 5 Report on Filing of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 28, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 28, 2010 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 28, 2010 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 27, 2010 3 PATENT COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation (Filing Fee $350 , receipt number 0758-677726) by Motorola Mobility, Inc. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent #6992580, issued 01/21/06, held by Motorola Mobility, Inc.; Patent #7106358, issued 09/12/06, held by Motorola Mobility, Inc.; Patent #6686931, issued 02/03/04, held by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 6992580, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 7106358, # 3 Exhibit C - Patent No. 6686931, # 4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, # 5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons) (Hansen, Scott) Modified exhibit letters on 12/27/2010. (mmo/t) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 23, 2010 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]
December 23, 2010 1 Disregard. Refiled as entry 3 . Filed in error, counsel contacted court. Modified on 12/27/2010. (arw) Modified on 12/27/2010. (mmo) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/8/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Scott W. Hansen
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Lisa Nester Kass
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Anthony Pastor
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Rebecca Frihart Kennedy
Represented By: Scott W. Hansen
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Lisa Nester Kass
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Anthony Pastor
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: J Donald Best
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Christopher C. Davis
Represented By: David E. Killough
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John W McBride
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: John Scheller
Represented By: J Donald Best
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Christopher C. Davis
Represented By: David E. Killough
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John W McBride
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: John Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Scott W. Hansen
Represented By: Rebecca Frihart Kennedy
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Lisa Nester Kass
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Anthony Pastor
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: J Donald Best
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Christopher C. Davis
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: David E. Killough
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: John W McBride
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: John Scheller
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]