BP West Coast Products, LLC v. Shalabi et al

Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5362, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 6026, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 6530, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5490, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5816, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5854, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5911, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5568, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5660, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 4490, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5303, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 5893, LLC, Pyramid Gold, Inc., Wild Dee, Inc., CC & L Group, LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 6031 LLC, Harbor Olympic Land 6067, LLC, Hatem Shalabi and Harbor Olympic Land, LLC
Plaintiff: BP West Coast Products, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01341
Filed: August 12, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 113 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant's expert witnesses by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
August 12, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and resetting Noting Date for 8/22/2011. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (MGC)
June 19, 2013 149 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 132 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
August 6, 2013 154 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 126 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (CL)
June 11, 2014 177 Featured Case ORDER denying 166 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena in a Civil Case Directed to Third-Party United Central Bank; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
October 14, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
February 10, 2012 64 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
June 14, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BP West Coast Products, LLC v. Shalabi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5362, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 6026, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 6530, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5490, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5816, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5854, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5911, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5568, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5660, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 4490, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5303, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 5893, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Gold, Inc.
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Dee, Inc.
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC & L Group, LLC
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 6031 LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land 6067, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatem Shalabi
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Olympic Land, LLC
Represented By: David A. Schiller
Represented By: Adam T Birnbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP West Coast Products, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Douglas Clayton Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]