Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Counter_claimant: Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Microsoft Corporation
Counter_defendant: Microsoft Corporation and Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Mediator: Edward A. Infante
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv01408
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 382 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 7/20/2012 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Debbie Zurn by telephone at 206-370-8504. or by e-mail at debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012, (DZ)
August 9, 2012 381 Featured Case ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
July 31, 2012 380 NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Kevin J. Post. Filed by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Post, Kevin) Address updated on 8/2/2012 (KN). Modified Address on 8/3/2012 (DS).
July 24, 2012 379 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE ; filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 20, 2012 378 Featured Case ORDER, The Court ADMITS phv atty Anthony Balkissoon for dft Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL) Modified text on 7/24/2012 (CL).
July 20, 2012 377 Featured Case ORDER the Court ADMITS phv atty Douglas I Lewis for dft Microsoft, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL)
July 20, 2012 376 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jesse Jenner, Lynn Engel, Steven Pepe, Stuart Yothers, Khue Hoang, Mark Rowland, Ralph Palumbo (by telephone); Def Counsel: Christopher Wion, Theodore Chandler, Shubham Mulcherjee, Rick Cederoth, Douglas Lewis, Tony Balkissoon, David Pritikin, Andy Culbert, Arthur Harrigan; CR: Debbie Zurn; Markman Hearing held on 7/20/2012. (CC)
July 19, 2012 375 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony Balkissoon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2886076. (Cramer, Shane)
July 19, 2012 374 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Douglas I. Lewis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2886072. (Cramer, Shane)
July 19, 2012 373 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER Regarding the Markman Hearing Scheduled for July 20, 2012, by Judge James L. Robart, United States District Judge. (TF)
July 18, 2012 372 Letter from Motorola and Microsoft re July 20, 2012 Markman Hearing Order of Arguments. (McCune, Philip)
July 16, 2012 371 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY ALL PENDING PATENT-INFRINGEMENT RELATED CASES AND CLAIMS BETWEEN THE PLAINTIFF MICROSOFT AND DEFENDANTS MOTOROLA, ET AL by Judge James L. Robart. (docket number 355 in case number CV10-1823 JLR)(TF)
July 9, 2012 370 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 350 MOTION TO SEAL by Judge James L. Robart; The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain the seal on Docket Numbers 353 and 354. (TF)
July 5, 2012 369 DECLARATION of Christopher Wion in Support of Microsoft's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Markman #2) re 368 Brief - Responsive by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1125, # 2 Exhibit 1126, # 3 Exhibit 1127, # 4 Exhibit 1128, # 5 Exhibit 1203)(Wion, Christopher)
July 5, 2012 368 RESPONSIVE BRIEF Microsoft's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Markman #2) re 348 Brief - Opening by Defendant Microsoft Corporation.. (Wion, Christopher)
July 5, 2012 367 DECLARATION of Philip S. McCune in Support of Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief ("Markman #2") re 366 Brief - Responsive by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P)(Palumbo, Ralph)
July 5, 2012 366 RESPONSIVE BRIEF Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief ("Markman #2") re 351 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc... (Palumbo, Ralph)
June 25, 2012 365 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Tutorial held on 6/14/2012 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Debbie Zurn by telephone at 206-370-8504. or by e-mail at debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2012, (DZ)
June 14, 2012 364 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jesse Jenner, Ralph Palumbo, Steve Pepe, Stuart Yothers, Khue Hoang, Mark Rowland; Def Counsel: Arthur Harrigan, Theodore Chandler, Shubham Mukherjee, John McBride, Christopher Wion, Rick Cederoth, Andy Culbert, David Pritikin; CR: Debbie Zurn; Status Conference/Tutorial held on 6/14/2012. Tutorials are presented by counsel. (CC)
June 13, 2012 363 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., to 350 MOTION to Seal Documents. (Palumbo, Ralph)
June 11, 2012 362 Featured Case ORDER re 360 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shubham Mukherjee for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 11, 2012 361 Featured Case ORDER re 359 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore W. Chandler for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 11, 2012 360 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shubham Mukherjee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2842069. (Cramer, Shane)
June 11, 2012 359 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore W. Chandler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2842061. (Cramer, Shane)
June 5, 2012 358 Featured Case ORDER re 356 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Khue V. Hoang for Motorola Mobility, Inc. by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
June 4, 2012 357 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Other Affiliate Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
June 4, 2012 356 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Khue V. Hoang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2835779. (McCune, Philip)
June 4, 2012 355 Featured Case ORDER on Claim Construction by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
June 1, 2012 354 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Christopher Wion in Support of Microsoft's Opening Claim Construction Brief on Microsoft's Patents and Motorola's '333 Patent (with Sealed Exhibits 1111, 1112 & 1503) by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re 350 MOTION to Seal Documents (Harrigan, Arthur)
June 1, 2012 353 SEALED DOCUMENT Microsoft's Opening Claim Construction Brief on Microsoft's Patents and Motorola's '333 Patent [Unredacted] by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re 350 MOTION to Seal Documents (Harrigan, Arthur)
June 1, 2012 352 DECLARATION of Christopher Wion re 351 Brief - Opening by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1101, # 2 Exhibit 1102, # 3 Exhibit 1103, # 4 Exhibit 1104, # 5 Exhibit 1105, # 6 Exhibit 1106, # 7 Exhibit 1107, # 8 Exhibit 1108, # 9 Exhibit 1109, # 10 Exhibit 1110, # 11 Exhibit 1111, # 12 Exhibit 1112, # 13 Exhibit 1113, # 14 Exhibit 1114, # 15 Exhibit 1115, # 16 Exhibit 1120, # 17 Exhibit 1121, # 18 Exhibit 1122, # 19 Exhibit 1123, # 20 Exhibit 1124, # 21 Exhibit 1201, # 22 Exhibit 1202, # 23 Exhibit 1301, # 24 Exhibit 1302, # 25 Exhibit 1303, # 26 Exhibit 1401, # 27 Exhibit 1402, # 28 Exhibit 1403, # 29 Exhibit 1404, # 30 Exhibit 1501, # 31 Exhibit 1502, # 32 Exhibit 1503, # 33 Exhibit 1504, # 34 Exhibit 1505)(Harrigan, Arthur)
June 1, 2012 351 OPENING BRIEF Microsoft's [Redacted] Opening Claim Construction Brief on Microsoft's Patents and Motorola's '333 Patent (Markman #2) by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Harrigan, Arthur)
June 1, 2012 350 MOTION to Seal Documents by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/15/2012, (Harrigan, Arthur)
June 1, 2012 349 DECLARATION of Philip S. McCune re 348 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-E (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit E (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit E (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H-I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L-M, # 11 Exhibit N-O)(Palumbo, Ralph)
June 1, 2012 348 OPENING BRIEF Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief ("Markman #2") by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A)(Palumbo, Ralph)
May 30, 2012 347 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 5/16/2012 Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206/370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2012, (McGrath, Kari)
May 16, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: A tutorial is scheduled Thursday, June 14, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Hon. James L. Robart. (CC)
May 16, 2012 346 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jesse Jenner, Ralph Palumbo, James Batchelder, Mark Rowland, Leslie Spencer, Philip McCune, Darrell Stark; Def Counsel: John McBride, David Greenfield, Arthur Harrigan, Rick Cederoth, David Killough; CR: Kari McGrath; MARKMAN Hearing held on 5/16/2012. The court hears argument from counsel and takes the matter under advisement. (CC)
May 15, 2012 345 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re Markman hearing set for 5/16/12 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
May 15, 2012 344 Featured Case ORDER re 343 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James R. Batchelder for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 15, 2012 343 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James R. Batchelder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2815248. (McCune, Philip)
May 14, 2012 342 Featured Case ORDER re 341 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Darrell W Stark for Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 14, 2012 341 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Darrell W. Stark FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2813866. (McCune, Philip)
May 11, 2012 340 Letter from Motorola and Microsoft re May 16, 2012 Markman Hearing Order of Arguments. (McCune, Philip)
May 7, 2012 339 Featured Case ORDER re 338 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Greenfield for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
May 4, 2012 338 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Allan Greenfield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2805637. (Cramer, Shane)
May 2, 2012 337 RESPONSIVE BRIEF Microsoft's Claim Construction Response Brief re 328 Brief - Opening by Defendant Microsoft Corporation.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Cramer, Shane)
May 2, 2012 336 RESPONSIVE BRIEF Motorola's Responsive Claim Construction Brief re 330 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc... (Palumbo, Ralph)
April 30, 2012 335 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 4/5/2012 Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206/370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2012, (McGrath, Kari) Modified on 4/30/2012; DUPLICATE ENTRY; SEE DOCKET 332 (LMK).
April 23, 2012 334 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Tutorial held on 4/11/2012 Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Debbie Zurn by telephone at 206-370-8504. or by e-mail at debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012, (DZ)
April 11, 2012 333 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Arthur Harrigan, David Pritikin, Andy Culbert, John McBride; Def Counsel: Jesse Jenner, Ralph Palumbo, Neill Taylor, Mark Rowland; CR: Debbie Zurn; In Court Hearing/Tutorial held on 4/11/2012. Tutorials are presented by Mark Rowland, John McBride and Allison Klein. (CC)
April 10, 2012 332 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 4/5/2012 Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Kari McGrath by telephone at 206-370-8509 or by e-mail at kari_mcgrath@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2012, (McGrath, Kari)
April 6, 2012 331 DECLARATION OF DAVID GREENFIELD IN SUPPORT OF MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re 330 Brief - Opening by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Harrigan, Arthur)
April 6, 2012 330 OPENING BRIEF Microsoft Corporation's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Harrigan, Arthur)
April 6, 2012 329 DECLARATION in Support of Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief of Philip S. McCune re 328 Brief - Opening by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, pp 4-23, # 2 Exhibit A-2, pp 24-33, # 3 Exhibit A-3, pp 34-58, # 4 Exhibit A-4, pp 59-93, # 5 Exhibit A-5, pp 94-127, # 6 Exhibit B-3, pp 128-155, # 7 Exhibit F-I, pp 156-181)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 6, 2012 328 OPENING BRIEF Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
April 5, 2012 327 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Ralph Palumbo, Philip McCune, Jesse Jenner, Steven Pepe; Def Counsel: Arthur Harrigan, David Pritikin, John McBride, Ellen Robbins; CR: Kari McGrath; Status Conference held on 4/5/2012. Counsel shall contact the clerk with proposed dates to schedule tutorials regarding the patents involved in the second and third Markman hearings. The court directs supplementation of existing discovery, but will not authorize supplemental discovery. However, after the Markman rulings, counsel may raise the issue of additional discovery.Dispositive motions shall be filed within 14 days after the order is published in the third Markman hearing. The court sets a May 13, 2013 trial date. (CC)
April 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The tutorial scheduled Wednesday, April 11, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for 9:00 a.m. (CC)
April 4, 2012 NOTICE - A status conference is scheduled Thursday, April 5, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. In the event counsel wish to participate by telephone, the call-in number is 888-352-5988. Access code: 5969046. (CC)
April 3, 2012 326 EXHIBIT 1 to Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Regarding the Parties' Asserted Patents re 315 Statement by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
April 3, 2012 325 Featured Case ORDER re 324 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John McBride for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 3, 2012 324 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John McBride FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2767452. (Cramer, Shane)
April 2, 2012 323 EXHIBIT CC-FF re 317 Declaration (non motion) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DD-EE, # 2 Exhibit FF, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit FF, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit FF, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit FF, Part 4)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 322 EXHIBIT Z-BB re 317 Declaration (non motion) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Z, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Z, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Z, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit AA, # 5 Exhibit BB)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 321 DECLARATION OF SHANE P. CRAMER IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT REGARDING THE PARTIES ASSERTED PATENTS re 316 Statement by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GG, # 2 Exhibit HH, # 3 Exhibit JJ, # 4 Exhibit KK, # 5 Exhibit LL, # 6 Exhibit MM, # 7 Exhibit OO, # 8 Exhibit NN, # 9 Exhibit PP, # 10 Exhibit QQ, # 11 Exhibit RR, # 12 Exhibit SS, # 13 Exhibit TT, # 14 Exhibit UU, # 15 Exhibit VV, # 16 Exhibit WW, # 17 Exhibit XX, # 18 Exhibit YY, # 19 Exhibit ZZ, # 20 Exhibit AAA, # 21 Exhibit BBB, # 22 Exhibit CCC, # 23 Exhibit DDD, # 24 Exhibit II, # 25 Exhibit EEE, # 26 Exhibit FFF)(Cramer, Shane)
April 2, 2012 320 EXHIBIT Q-Y re 317 Declaration (non motion) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit R, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit R, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit S-T, # 5 Exhibit U-V)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 319 EXHIBIT B-P re 317 Declaration (non motion) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-F, # 2 Exhibit G-J, # 3 Exhibit K-L, # 4 Exhibit M-N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 318 EXHIBIT A, Parts 1-7 re 317 Declaration (non motion) by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 7)(Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 317 DECLARATION in Support of Motorola's Exhibits to the Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart of Philip S. McCune re 316 Statement by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 316 STATEMENT Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
April 2, 2012 315 STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Regarding the Parties' Asserted Patents by Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
March 30, 2012 314 Featured Case ORDER re 313 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ellen S. Robbins for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
March 30, 2012 313 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ellen R. Robbins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2763967. (Cramer, Shane)
March 23, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference scheduled April 3, 2012 is continued to Thursday, April 5, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. before Hon. James L. Robart. (CC)
March 22, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: A status conference is scheduled Tuesday, April 3, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Hon. James L. Robart.(CC)
March 22, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The court sets the following deadlines: Joint Claim Chart and Prehearing Statement - March 31, 2012. Opening Briefs - April 6, 2012. Tutorial - April 11, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Responsive Briefs - May 2, 2011. Markman Hearing No. 1 - MAY 16, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Open Briefs - June 1, 2012. Responsive Briefs - July 5, 2012. Markman Hearing No. 2 - JULY 20, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Opening Briefs - August 24, 2012. Responsive Briefs - September 14, 2012. Markman Hearing No. 3 - OCTOBER 5, 2012 at 9:00 a.m.(CC)
March 14, 2012 312 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 15 - 30.. (Harrigan, Arthur)
February 27, 2012 311 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Pla Counsel: Arthur Harrigan; Def Counsel: Ralph Palumbo; Telephone Conference held on 2/27/2012. The court extends the deadline to March 14, 2012 to file the Joint Status Report. (CC)
January 30, 2012 310 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - All pending motions and deadlines are Vacated. Joint Status Report due by 2/29/2012, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
January 27, 2012 309 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Palumbo, Ralph)
January 27, 2012 308 NOTICE of Stricken Telephone Conference. The telephone conference scheduled Monday, January 30, 2012 is stricken. (CC)
January 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference scheduled January 10, 2012 is continued to Monday, January 30, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. before Hon. James L. Robart. (CC)
December 23, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Conference to discuss the Joint Status Report is scheduled Tuesday, January 10, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Hon. James L. Robart. (CC)
November 28, 2011 307 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 15-30.. (McCune, Philip)
September 29, 2011 306 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/28/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/14/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/28/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
September 16, 2011 252 Featured Case ORDER re 251 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Josef B. Schenker for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL)
September 15, 2011 251 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josef B. Schenker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2557589. (McCune, Philip)
September 13, 2011 250 Featured Case ORDER re 249 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark D. Rowland for Motorola Mobility, Inc. by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 12, 2011 249 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark D. Rowland FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2553425. (McCune, Philip)
September 7, 2011 248 Featured Case ORDER re 238 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Norman H. Beamer for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 247 Featured Case ORDER re 232 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stuart W. Yothers for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 246 Featured Case ORDER re 231 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda F. Wieker for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 245 Featured Case ORDER re 230 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Leslie M. Spencer for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 244 Featured Case ORDER re 229 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS R. Andrew Schwentker for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 243 Featured Case ORDER re 228 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul M. Schoenhard for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 242 Featured Case ORDER re 227 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Megan F. Raymond for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only).(DS)
September 7, 2011 241 Featured Case ORDER re 226 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin J. Post for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 7, 2011 240 Featured Case ORDER re 225 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven Pepe for for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) Modified on 9/7/2011 (DS).
September 6, 2011 239 Featured Case ORDER re 224 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian Kao for for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) Modified on 9/7/2011 (DS).
September 6, 2011 238 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Norman H. Beamer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2546755. (McCune, Philip)
September 6, 2011 237 Featured Case ORDER re 223 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jesse J. Jenner for for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) Modified on 9/7/2011 (DS).
September 6, 2011 236 Featured Case ORDER re 222 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicole M. Jantzi for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) Modified on 9/7/2011 (DS).
September 6, 2011 235 Featured Case ORDER re 221 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gabrielle E. Higgens for Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., and Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) Modified on 9/7/2011 (DS).
September 6, 2011 234 Featured Case ORDER re 219 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David T. Pritikin for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 6, 2011 233 Featured Case ORDER re 218 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard A. Cederoth for Microsoft Corporation by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
September 2, 2011 232 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stuart W. Yothers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545220. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 231 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda F. Wieker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545219. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 230 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Leslie M. Spencer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545217. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 229 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY R. Andrew Schwentker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545208. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 228 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul M. Schoenhard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545205. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 227 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Megan Raymond FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545201. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 226 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin J. Post FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545193. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 225 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven Pepe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545189. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 224 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian Kao FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545186. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 223 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jesse J. Jenner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545180. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 222 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicole M. Jantzi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545177. (McCune, Philip)
September 2, 2011 221 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gabrielle E. Higgins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2545166. (McCune, Philip)
September 1, 2011 220 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (JT)
August 26, 2011 219 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David T. Pritikin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2538025. (Cramer, Shane)
August 26, 2011 218 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard A. Cederoth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2538024. (Cramer, Shane)
August 26, 2011 217 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shane P. Cramer on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Cramer, Shane)
August 26, 2011 216 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip S McCune on behalf of Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (McCune, Philip)
August 25, 2011 215 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Florida Southern and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) Modified on 8/26/2011: mailed copy of letter to attorney William M. Chang. (PM).
August 25, 2011 214 PUBLIC NOTE. At the time of transfer into the Western District of Washington, no documents were associated with the following docket numbers: 139-162, 165-166, 171, 174, 180-189, 191-207. (HBR)
August 25, 2011 213 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 10/6/2011. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (RE) Modified on 8/26/2011: mailed copy of Notice to attorney William M. Chang (PM).
August 25, 2011 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (RE)
August 25, 2011 212 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern, Case Number 1:10-cv-24063;. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2011: # 2 Email transferring case to Western District of Washington) (PM).
August 17, 2011 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion to Transfer this Action to the Western District of Washington. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 8/17/2011. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 16, 2011 210 Featured Case ORDER on Discovery - see order for full details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 8/16/2011. (dt) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 15, 2011 209 Clerks Notice to Filer re 171 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other), 174 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other). Sealed Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - The Filer failed to file a sealed document in the conventional paper format. The document has been restricted and the docket text has been corrected. It is not necessary to refile the document but future sealed filings must be filed in the conventional paper format in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 12, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Trial and Certain Pretrial Dates re 190 MOTION for Specially Set Trial Date filed by Microsoft Corporation. Jury Trial set for two-week period beginning 3/12/2012 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno, Calendar Call for 3/6/2012 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno, Discovery due by 11/4/2011, In Limine Motions due by 12/13/2011, Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/30/11, Mediation completed by 12/16/11, Motions due by 12/13/2011, Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/28/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/12/11. (tp) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 207 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 206 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 205 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 12, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 204 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 203 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 202 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 201 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 200 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 199 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 198 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 197 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 196 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 195 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 194 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 193 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 192 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 11, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 191 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 190 MOTION for Specially Set Trial Date by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 189 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 188 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 187 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 186 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 185 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 184 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 183 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 182 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 181 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 10, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 180 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 9, 2011 179 CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown pursuant to DE# 178 . (dgj) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 9, 2011 178 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/8/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 174 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 171 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 177 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 802, # 3 Exhibit 906, # 4 Exhibit 907, # 5 Exhibit 908, # 6 Exhibit 909, # 7 Exhibit 910, # 8 Exhibit 1005, # 9 Exhibit 1006, # 10 Exhibit 1117, # 11 Exhibit 1118, # 12 Exhibit 1119, # 13 Exhibit 1120, # 14 Exhibit 1121, # 15 Exhibit 1122, # 16 Exhibit 1411)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 176 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 175 RESPONSE to Motion re 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Replies due by 8/18/2011. (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 173 RESPONSE/REPLY Microsoft Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Microsoft's Expert Robert Zeidman and Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re 121 MOTION for Use of Representative Claims filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 169 STIPULATION and Joint Motion on Motions in Limine and Incorporated Proposed Order by Microsoft Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 8, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER granting 120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/6/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 5, 2011 167 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 164 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Intent to Oppose Motorola's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time [doc.164] (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 5, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 166 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ch1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 5, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 165 restricted/sealed until further notice. (ch1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
August 4, 2011 164 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Out of Time and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Giuliano, Douglas) Modified text on 8/5/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kelley Conaty. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 22468. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 162 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 161 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 160 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 159 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 158 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 157 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 155 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 154 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 153 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 152 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 151 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 150 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 149 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 148 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 147 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 146 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 145 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 144 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 143 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 142 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 141 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 140 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 25, 2011 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 139 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 22, 2011 138 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 135 Trial Brief of Filing Supplemental Exhibits to Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Index of Supplemental Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 504, # 3 Exhibit 1002, # 4 Exhibit 1003, # 5 Exhibit 1101, # 6 Exhibit 1103, # 7 Exhibit 1104, # 8 Exhibit 1106, # 9 Exhibit 1107, # 10 Exhibit 1108, # 11 Exhibit 1109, # 12 Exhibit 1113)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 22, 2011 137 NOTICE of Striking 133 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Microsoft Corporation by Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 22, 2011 136 Clerks Notice to Filer re 123 MOTION on Opening Claim Construction Brief, 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 134 , 135 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 135 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Microsoft Corporation. See 124 for image.(asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 134 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Motorola Mobility, Inc. See 123 for image (asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 133 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Filing Additional Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index to Additional Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1103, # 3 Exhibit 1104, # 4 Exhibit 1106, # 5 Exhibit 1107, # 6 Exhibit 1108, # 7 Exhibit 1109, # 8 Exhibit 1113)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 132 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Michael Wagner Concerning Non-Infringing Alternatives and Memorandum of Law in Support by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl).[Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 131 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Martin Kaliski (Redacted) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 130 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Christian Tegillis (Redacted) and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 129 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 and Brief in Support Thereof by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit in Support, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit in Support, # 4 Exhibit C to Affidavit in Support, # 5 Exhibit D to Affidavit in Support, # 6 Exhibit E to Affidavit in Support, # 7 Exhibit F to Affidavit in Support, # 8 Exhibit G to Affidavit in Support, # 9 Exhibit H to Affidavit in Support, # 10 Exhibit I to Affidavit in Support, # 11 Exhibit J to Affidavit in Support, # 12 Exhibit K to Affidavit in Support, # 13 Exhibit L to Affidavit in Support, # 14 Exhibit M to Affidavit in Support)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 128 Defendant's MOTION in Limine (Redacted) by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 127 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Appendix Index to Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 19, # 15 Exhibit 20)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 126 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) of Noninfringement for U.S. Patent Nos. 5,502,839, 5,784,001, and 6,272,333, and that Motorola Cannot Recover Damages Prior to Nov. 10, 2010 by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 125 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Index to Exhibits), # 2 Exhibit 101, # 3 Exhibit 102, # 4 Exhibit 201, # 5 Exhibit 301, # 6 Exhibit 302, # 7 Exhibit 304, # 8 Exhibit 305, # 9 Exhibit 501, # 10 Exhibit 502, # 11 Exhibit 504, # 12 Exhibit 601, # 13 Exhibit 801 (Part 1), # 14 Exhibit 801 (Part 2), # 15 Exhibit 901, # 16 Exhibit 902, # 17 Exhibit 903, # 18 Exhibit 904, # 19 Exhibit 905, # 20 Exhibit 1101, # 21 Exhibit 1102, # 22 Exhibit 1105, # 23 Exhibit 1110, # 24 Exhibit 1114, # 25 Exhibit 1115, # 26 Exhibit 1116, # 27 Exhibit 1201, # 28 Exhibit 1301, # 29 Exhibit 1302, # 30 Exhibit 1303, # 31 Exhibit 1304, # 32 Exhibit 1305, # 33 Exhibit 1401, # 34 Exhibit 1402, # 35 Exhibit 1403, # 36 Exhibit 1404, # 37 Exhibit 1405, # 38 Exhibit 1406, # 39 Exhibit 1407, # 40 Exhibit 1408, # 41 Exhibit 1409)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 124 Defendant's MOTION Claim Construction by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis) Modified to re-docket, see 135 on 7/22/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 123 MOTION on Opening Claim Construction Brief by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit C, # 4 Exhibit Part 1 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 5 Exhibit Part 2 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 6 Exhibit Part 3 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 7 Exhibit Part 4a of 18 to Affidavit C, # 8 Exhibit Part 4b of 18 to Affidavit C, # 9 Exhibit Part 5 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 10 Exhibit Part 6 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 11 Exhibit Part 7 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 12 Exhibit Part 8 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 13 Exhibit Part 9 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 14 Exhibit Part 10 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 15 Exhibit Part 11 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 16 Exhibit Part 12 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 17 Exhibit Part 13 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 18 Exhibit Part 14 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 19 Exhibit Part 15 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 20 Exhibit Part 16 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 21 Exhibit Part 17 of 18 to Affidavit C, # 22 Exhibit Part 18 of 18 to Affidavit C)(Mullins, Edward) Modified to re-docket, see 134 on 7/22/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 122 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Claim Construction Briefs) by Microsoft Corporation. (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 21, 2011 121 MOTION for Use of Representative Claims and Accompanying Memorandum of Law in Support by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward) Modified text on 7/22/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 19, 2011 120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael P. Kahn. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 22133. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 19, 2011 119 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 115 116 117 and 118 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/19/11. (dge) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 13, 2011 117 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Nelson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21738. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 12, 2011 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole M. Jantzi. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21739. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 11, 2011 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles K. Verhoeven. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 61622. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 8, 2011 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward J. DeFranco. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21517. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 113 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 112 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 111 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 110 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 109 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 7, 2011 108 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 6, 2011 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yongdan Li. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21436. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 6, 2011 107 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Issuance of Suboena to Third Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 5, 2011 Attorney Kevin C. Wheeler terminated per 105 Notice of Withdrawal of counsel. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Kevin Wheeler. (asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 5, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 100 101 102 103 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/5/11. (dge) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 5, 2011 105 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
July 1, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/30/11. (dge) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 29, 2011 103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathleen L. Holthuas. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21165. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 29, 2011 102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Galligan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21164. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 29, 2011 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tamar B. Kelber. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21163. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 29, 2011 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher G. Wilson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21162. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 28, 2011 99 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David J. Wolfsohn. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21068. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 28, 2011 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony Balkissoon. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21095. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 28, 2011 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerald L. Angst. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21093. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 28, 2011 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frank J. Favia, Jr. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 21094. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 28, 2011 95 Featured Case ORDER granting 94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/27/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 22, 2011 94 MOTION for the Admission of Josef B. Schenker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20731. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 20, 2011 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 92 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/20/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 16, 2011 92 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William M. Chang. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20371. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 16, 2011 91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael L. Lisak. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 20372. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 15, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/14/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 14, 2011 89 REPLY in Support of 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law Reply in Support of Microsoft's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Miner, Curtis) Modified text on 6/15/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 8, 2011 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Neil H. Wyland. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19953. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 8, 2011 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth Curtin. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19954. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 8, 2011 86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen C. Carlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19955. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 8, 2011 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sherry A. Knutson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19956. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 8, 2011 84 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shubham Mukherjee. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19957. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 83 MOTION for the Admission of R. Andrew Schwentker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19883. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 82 MOTION for the Admission of Erin Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19876. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 81 MOTION for the Admission of Priti Langer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19875. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 80 MOTION for the Admission of David Elihu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19874. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 79 MOTION for the Admission of Amanda Wieker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19873. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin B. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19865. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole D. Sims. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19864. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Olivia M. Kim. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19863. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 7, 2011 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Aseem S. Gupta. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19862. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 6, 2011 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Affidavit, # 29 Affidavit, # 30 Affidavit)(Giuliano, Douglas) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 2, 2011 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dale B. Nixon. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19710. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 2, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
June 1, 2011 71 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 66 Order on Motion for Clarification. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (dgj) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 31, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/31/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 27, 2011 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nabeel U. Khan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19439. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 27, 2011 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erik J. Carlson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 19440. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 26, 2011 Attorney Jim S. Zeng terminated as per DE 67 Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jim Zeng. (lk) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 25, 2011 67 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 25, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/24/2011. (ahy) Modified action type on 6/1/2011 (dgj). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 25, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/24/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 23, 2011 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/23/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 23, 2011 63 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/20/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 19, 2011 62 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer This Action to the Western District of Washington and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 6/6/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A David Kaefer's Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to David Kaefer's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Curtis Miner's Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Group Exhibit C to Motion, # 23 Exhibit Group Exhibit D to Motion)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 18, 2011 61 MOTION for the Admission of Brian Kao to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18976. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 18, 2011 60 MOTION for the Admission of Stuart W. Yothers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18975. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 18, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/18/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 17, 2011 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erin E. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18886. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 17, 2011 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael C. Lee. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18887. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 17, 2011 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sandra S. Fujiyama. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18888. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 17, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/16/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 17, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER denying 49 Motion to Include Pretrial Dates on Claim Construction and Expert Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/16/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 16, 2011 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul D. Tripodi, II. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 18836. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 12, 2011 52 Joint MOTION Request for Status Conference by Motorola Mobility, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) Modified relief on 5/13/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
May 12, 2011 51 Joint MOTION for clarification of Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs by Motorola Mobility, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Responses due by 5/31/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Joint Motion for Schedule, # 2 Exhibit B Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 14, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/13/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 10, 2011 49 Joint MOTION to Include Pretrial Dates on Claim Construction and Expert Discovery 36 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas) Modified text on 4/11/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 6, 2011 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Philip W. Woo. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16871. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 6, 2011 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ellen S. Robbins. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16870. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 6, 2011 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Herman F. Webley. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 16872. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
April 6, 2011 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
March 11, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/11/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
March 1, 2011 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tung T. Nguyen. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 14728. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
February 16, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/15/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
February 7, 2011 41 MOTION for the Admission of Khue V. Hoang to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 13732. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
February 7, 2011 40 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Lucas, Hal) Modified text on 2/8/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 31, 2011 39 First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Microsoft Corporation by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 21, 2011 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re 35 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 37 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 20, 2011 37 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Edward A. Infante added and Compliance with Pretrial Order Setting Conference. See 35 for image.(asl) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 20, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Trial and Certain Pretrial Dates, ( Discovery due by 7/7/2011., Exhibit List due by 10/5/2011., Expert Witness List due by 10/5/2011., Mediation Deadline 8/3/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/11/2011., Calendar Call set for 10/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Jury Trial set for 10/24/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno. ). Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/20/2011. (rgs) Modified jury trial date on 3/18/2011 (wc). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 20, 2011 35 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Selection of Mediator and Compliance with Pretrial Order Setting Conference (Mullins, Edward) Modified to re-docket, see 37 on 1/21/2011 (asl). [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 20, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/20/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 18, 2011 33 Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Microsoft Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against Microsoft Corporation by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 18, 2011 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jim S. Zeng. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12752. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 18, 2011 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Theodore W. Chandler. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12751. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 14, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/12/2011. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Douglas I. Lewis. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard A. Cederoth. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian R. Nester. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David T. Pritikin. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin C. Wheeler. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 5, 2011 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John W. McBride. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12081. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
January 4, 2011 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Calendar Call set for 7/12/2011 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno., Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2011., Discovery due by 4/7/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/5/2011.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/3/2011.). Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/4/2011. (rgs) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 23, 2010 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 23, 2010 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 21, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/20/2010. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 9, 2010 19 MOTION for the Admission of Megan F. Raymond to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 10928. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 9, 2010 18 Featured Case Endorsed ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Microsoft Corporation response due 12/23/2010. (This is a paperless order.) Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/9/2010. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 6, 2010 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint, Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 6, 2010 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Bradley Miner on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Miner, Curtis) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
December 3, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/2/2010. (ahy) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 29, 2010 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, from Chief Financial Officer State of Florida Acknowledgment filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 13 MOTION for the Admission of Kevin J. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0328. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 12 MOTION for the Admission of Jesse J. Jenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0334. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 11 MOTION for the Admission of Steven Pepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0333. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 10 MOTION for the Admission of Mark D. Rowland to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0332. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 9 MOTION for the Admission of Norman H. Beamer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0331. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 8 MOTION for the Admission of Gabrielle E. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0330. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 24, 2010 7 MOTION for the Admission of Leslie M. Spencer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 0329. (ksa) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 17, 2010 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 12, 2010 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 12, 2010 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (gme) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 12, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (gme) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 10, 2010 2 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno (gme) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]
November 10, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3301685, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from flsd on 8/25/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: David Elihu
Represented By: Erin Greenfield
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Higgins
Represented By: Khue V. Hoang
Represented By: Nicole Jantzi
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Michael P. Kahn
Represented By: Brian Kao
Represented By: Priti Langer
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Kevin J. Post
Represented By: Megan F. Raymond
Represented By: Mark D. Rowland
Represented By: Josef B. Schenker
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Represented By: R. Andrew Schwentker
Represented By: Leslie M Spencer
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Represented By: Amanda Wieker
Represented By: Stuart W. Yothers
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: David Elihu
Represented By: Erin Greenfield
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Higgins
Represented By: Khue V. Hoang
Represented By: Nicole Jantzi
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Michael P. Kahn
Represented By: Brian Kao
Represented By: Priti Langer
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Kevin J. Post
Represented By: Megan F. Raymond
Represented By: Mark D. Rowland
Represented By: Josef B. Schenker
Represented By: R. Andrew Schwentker
Represented By: Leslie M Spencer
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Represented By: Amanda Wieker
Represented By: Stuart W. Yothers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Gerald L. Angst
Represented By: Anthony Balkissoon
Represented By: Erik J. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen C. Carlson
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Theodore W. Chandler
Represented By: William M. Chang
Represented By: Kelley Conaty
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Curtin
Represented By: Frank J. Favia, Jr.
Represented By: Sandra Fujiyama
Represented By: Daniel J. Galligan
Represented By: Aseem S. Gupta
Represented By: Kathleen L. Holthaus
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Benjamin B. Kelly
Represented By: Erin E. Kelly
Represented By: Nabeel U. Khan
Represented By: Olivia M. Kim
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Michael C. Lee
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Yongdan Li
Represented By: Michael L. Lisak
Represented By: John W. McBride
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Shubham Mukherjee
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Represented By: Tung T. Nguyen
Represented By: Dale B. Nixon
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Ellen S. Robbins
Represented By: Nicole D. Sims
Represented By: Paul D. Tripodi, II
Represented By: Herman F. Webley
Represented By: Christopher G. Wilson
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Neil H. Wyland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Gerald L. Angst
Represented By: Anthony Balkissoon
Represented By: Erik J. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen C. Carlson
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Theodore W. Chandler
Represented By: William M. Chang
Represented By: Kelley Conaty
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Curtin
Represented By: Frank J. Favia, Jr.
Represented By: Sandra Fujiyama
Represented By: Daniel J. Galligan
Represented By: Aseem S. Gupta
Represented By: Kathleen L. Holthaus
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Benjamin B. Kelly
Represented By: Erin E. Kelly
Represented By: Nabeel U. Khan
Represented By: Olivia M. Kim
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Michael C. Lee
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Yongdan Li
Represented By: Michael L. Lisak
Represented By: John W. McBride
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Shubham Mukherjee
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Represented By: Tung T. Nguyen
Represented By: Dale B. Nixon
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Ellen S. Robbins
Represented By: Nicole D. Sims
Represented By: Paul D. Tripodi, II
Represented By: Herman F. Webley
Represented By: Christopher G. Wilson
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Neil H. Wyland
Represented By: Gerald L. Angst
Represented By: Anthony Balkissoon
Represented By: Erik J. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen C. Carlson
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Theodore W. Chandler
Represented By: William M. Chang
Represented By: Kelley Conaty
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Curtin
Represented By: Frank J. Favia, Jr.
Represented By: Sandra Fujiyama
Represented By: Daniel J. Galligan
Represented By: Aseem S. Gupta
Represented By: Kathleen L. Holthaus
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Benjamin B. Kelly
Represented By: Erin E. Kelly
Represented By: Nabeel U. Khan
Represented By: Olivia M. Kim
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Michael C. Lee
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Yongdan Li
Represented By: Michael L. Lisak
Represented By: John W. McBride
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Shubham Mukherjee
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Represented By: Tung T. Nguyen
Represented By: Dale B. Nixon
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Ellen S. Robbins
Represented By: Nicole D. Sims
Represented By: Paul D. Tripodi, II
Represented By: Herman F. Webley
Represented By: Christopher G. Wilson
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Neil H. Wyland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: David Elihu
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Represented By: Erin Greenfield
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Higgins
Represented By: Khue V. Hoang
Represented By: Nicole Jantzi
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Michael P. Kahn
Represented By: Brian Kao
Represented By: Priti Langer
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Kevin J. Post
Represented By: Megan F. Raymond
Represented By: Mark D. Rowland
Represented By: Josef B. Schenker
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Represented By: R. Andrew Schwentker
Represented By: Leslie M Spencer
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Represented By: Amanda Wieker
Represented By: Stuart W. Yothers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Edward A. Infante
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Giuliano
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Represented By: David Elihu
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: Norman H. Beamer
Represented By: Erin Greenfield
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Higgens
Represented By: Khue V. Hoang
Represented By: Nicole Jantzi
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: Michael P. Kahn
Represented By: Brian Kao
Represented By: Priti Langer
Represented By: Hal Michael Lucas
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Kevin J. Post
Represented By: Megan F. Raymond
Represented By: Mark D. Rowland
Represented By: Josef B. Schenker
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Represented By: R. Andrew Schwentker
Represented By: Leslie M Spencer
Represented By: Charles K. Verhoeven
Represented By: Amanda Wieker
Represented By: Stuart W. Yothers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Gerald L. Angst
Represented By: Anthony Balkissoon
Represented By: Erik J. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen C. Carlson
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Theodore W. Chandler
Represented By: William M. Chang
Represented By: Kelley Conaty
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Curtin
Represented By: Frank J. Favia, Jr.
Represented By: Sandra Fujiyama
Represented By: Daniel J. Galligan
Represented By: Aseem S. Gupta
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen L. Holthaus
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Benjamin B. Kelly
Represented By: Erin E. Kelly
Represented By: Nabeel U. Khan
Represented By: Olivia M. Kim
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Michael C. Lee
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Yongdan Li
Represented By: Michael L. Lisak
Represented By: John W. McBride
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Shubham Mukherjee
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Represented By: Tung T. Nguyen
Represented By: Dale B. Nixon
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Ellen S. Robbins
Represented By: Nicole D. Sims
Represented By: Paul D. Tripodi, II
Represented By: Herman F. Webley
Represented By: Christopher G. Wilson
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Represented By: David J. Wolfsohn
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Neil H. Wyland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]