Vosk International Co. v. Zao Gruppa Predpriyatij Ost et al

Defendant: Zao Gruppa Predpriyatij Ost and Zao Ost Aqua
Plaintiff: Vosk International Co.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01488
Filed: September 9, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dfts' 15 Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part pltf's 16 Motion to Vacate default by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
April 4, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Pursuant to the parties' 25 Stipulation, defts shall have until 5/1/2012 in which to answer, move or otherwise plead to pltf's complaint.(TF)
July 20, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 31 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
June 19, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Aqua-Life's 53 Motion to amend case schedule by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
October 9, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Aqua-Life's 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vosk International Co. v. Zao Gruppa Predpriyatij Ost et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zao Gruppa Predpriyatij Ost
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zao Ost Aqua
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vosk International Co.
Represented By: Michael G Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]