Jay v. United States of America

Petitioner: Douglas Jay
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv01851
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Expedite; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
March 2, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion re: waiver of attorney-client privilege; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
August 23, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER calling for surreply in 24 MOTION for Relief from Judgment and Motion for Certificate of Appealability filed by Douglas Jay; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
November 21, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for order of release pending consideration of habeas petition; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Jay
Represented By: Jason B Saunders
Represented By: Kimberly Noel Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: James D Oesterle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]