Bush v. Lee et al

Defendant: Syd S Peng, Shirley Kiang, Ian Robinson, Dennis Bracy, Robert Lee, Dickson V. Lee and Norman Mineta
Plaintiff: Russell L Bush
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01910
Filed: November 15, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR L&L ENERGY'S AND INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT until 5/29/2012 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
July 3, 2012 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR L&L ENERGY'S AND INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Deadline is extended until 8/15/2012. (TF)
March 13, 2014 42 Featured Case Stipulation and Order of withdrawal and substitution of attys by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Attys Timothy G Leyh,Tyler Lawrence Farmer and Shane P. Cramer added for dfts Dennis Bracy, Shirley Kiang, Dickson V. Lee, Robert Lee, Norman Mineta, Syd S Peng and Ian Robinson. Attorney Robert M Sulkin terminated. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bush v. Lee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd S Peng
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Kiang
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Robinson
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Bracy
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickson V. Lee
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Mineta
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell L Bush
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]