Medtrica Solutions Ltd. v. Cygnus Medical, LLC

Plaintiff: Medtrica Solutions Ltd.
Defendant: Cygnus Medical, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00538
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court DISREGARD, POSTED IN THE WRONG CASE. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ; the petition for return of E.V. to Croatia is denied by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS) Modified on 6/11/2013 (RS).
June 28, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
November 7, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 98 Motion to Compel by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 7, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft's 119 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 3, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 110 Motion for Summary Judgment of non-infringement by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 27, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-note Medtricas motion for reconsideration (Dkt. # 147 ) on the Court's calendar for June 6, 2014. (CL)
November 15, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 15, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 42 Motion to dismiss with prejudice first amended counterclaims by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 21, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 88 Motion to strike by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medtrica Solutions Ltd. v. Cygnus Medical, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medtrica Solutions Ltd.
Represented By: R. Broh Landsman
Represented By: Jessica C. Bromall
Represented By: Rod S Berman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cygnus Medical, LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Repper
Represented By: Daniel Gandara
Represented By: Stephen Ball
Represented By: Wesley W Whitmyer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]