Curtis et al v. Illumination Arts, Inc. et al

Defendant: Kimmie Lynn Thompson, John M. Thompson, Illumination Arts, Inc. and Illumination Arts Publishing, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Chara Curtis, Cynthia Aldrich and Alfred Currier
Case Number: 2:2012cv00991
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submissions Concerning Default Judgment, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
March 19, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SANCTIONS by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, cc to Fin'l Dept)
May 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
July 18, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' second motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. # 32 ) and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' second motion for sanctions (Dkt. # 30 ). The court strikes the trial date, but will reschedule it, if necessary. (CL)
November 21, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Sanctions and Partial Summary Judgment by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
February 12, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
February 12, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 74 Mr. Thompson's second Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
April 15, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
June 30, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 93 Motion for Sanctions; denying 94 Motion to Reconsider, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
July 17, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT against defendants by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis et al v. Illumination Arts, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimmie Lynn Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumination Arts, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illumination Arts Publishing, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chara Curtis
Represented By: Kurt E Kruckeberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Aldrich
Represented By: Kurt E Kruckeberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Currier
Represented By: Kurt E Kruckeberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]