Coleman Cable, Inc. v. TDE, Inc. et al

Defendant: Monte A Leen and TDE, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coleman Cable, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01243
Filed: July 19, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 108 Featured Case ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik, re: the parties' 104 Stipulation. (TF)
January 15, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
April 8, 2013 39 Featured Case SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
July 23, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Order to Show Cause, docket no. 75 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CL)
September 4, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's 31 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
September 4, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER granting dfts' 29 Motion to Compel by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coleman Cable, Inc. v. TDE, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte A Leen
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDE, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleman Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]