395 Lampe LLC v. Kawish LLC et al

Thirdparty_defendant: Overlook Partners LLC, The Blackstone Corporation, Prim 1988 Revocable Trust and Wayne L Prim
Plaintiff: 395 Lampe LLC
Defendant: Kawish LLC, Timothy L Blixseth and Jane Doe Blixseth
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01503
Filed: September 5, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion (Dkt. # 82 ) to exclude any expert witness for Defendants except Doug McDaniel, DENIES Defendants' motion (Dkt. # 88 ) to extend the discovery cutoff, and directs the clerk to TERMINATE Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. # 86 ) without prejudice. The court's scheduling order requires the parties to submit a joint statement akin to a pretrial order no later than December 19. (CL)
January 21, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: two-and-a-half day evidentiary hearing that began on January 7 by Judge Richard A Jones. The parties shall submit a joint statement in accordance with this order no later than February 6. (See order for complete details) (CL)
July 28, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Blixseth Entities' 121 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying the Prim Entities' 125 Motion to approve their proposed disposition of the Collateral WPT Interest; granting Keewaydin's 131 Motion to Intervene subject to it filing a complaint-in-intervention by 8/11/14; granting Prim Entities' 143 Motion for Leave to File their amended complaint by 8/4/14 by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
August 27, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 157 Motion for Order Directing Mediation by Judge Richard A Jones.(LMK)
November 18, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER - Motion terminated: 79 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Witnesses and Testimony by Judge Richard A Jones. (MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: 395 Lampe LLC v. Kawish LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Overlook Partners LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: The Blackstone Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Scott Linde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Prim 1988 Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jody M McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Wayne L Prim
Represented By: Thomas Scott Linde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 395 Lampe LLC
Represented By: Jody M McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawish LLC
Represented By: Paul Edward Brain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L Blixseth
Represented By: Paul Edward Brain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Blixseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]