Robinett et al v. Opus Bank et al

Defendant: Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson P.S., Opus Bank and Cascade Bank
Plaintiff: NW Land, LLC, Sunburst Place, LLC, John Robinett, Martin Robinett, Gary Ball, Robinett Holdings, LLC, Robinett Capital Assets, LLC, West Coast, Inc. and Colby Corporation
Thirdparty_defendant: Katherine Robinett and John Robinett
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Opus Bank
Counter_claimant: Opus Bank
Counter_defendant: John Robinett, Gary Ball, Colby Corporation, NW Land, LLC, Martin Robinett, Robinett Capital Assets, LLC, Robinett Holdings, LLC and West Coast, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01755
Filed: October 9, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS - 93 95 Motion in Limine; 100 Motion to Compel; 108 Response/Cross- Motion to Quash, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
October 30, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 46 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; granting 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
November 5, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Opus Banks Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice re: 63 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
December 16, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS by Judge Marsha J. Pechman; Deft's 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Pltfs' 75 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Pltfs' 80 Motion to Supplement the Record is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Pltfs' 79 Motion to Certify Local Law Question is DENIED. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinett et al v. Opus Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson P.S.
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opus Bank
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Bank
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NW Land, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunburst Place, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robinett
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Robinett
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ball
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinett Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinett Capital Assets, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Katherine Robinett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: John Robinett
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Opus Bank
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Opus Bank
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Robinett
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gary Ball
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Colby Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: NW Land, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Martin Robinett
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robinett Capital Assets, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robinett Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: West Coast, Inc.
Represented By: William Mitchell Cogdill, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]