Ramgen Power Systems, LLC v. Agilis Engineering, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ramgen Power Systems LLC
Defendant: Agilis Engineering Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01762
Filed: October 9, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER striking Defendant's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment & 48 Motion for Sanctions. Defendant has until 5/30/2014 to file a single dispositive motion, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
May 28, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER Denying 56 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
August 20, 2014 88 Featured Case ORDER denying 61 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and sanctions, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramgen Power Systems, LLC v. Agilis Engineering, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramgen Power Systems LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Represented By: Michael A. Goldfarb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilis Engineering Inc
Represented By: Peter Steilberg
Represented By: Marshall E Rosenbach
Represented By: Dean Rosenbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]