Townsley v. Geico Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Estralitta Townsley
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01909
Filed: October 29, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCLOSURES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/7/2013, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 6/21/2013. (TF)
June 27, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 12 Motion to Compel FRCP 35 Mental Examination by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CL)
July 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft's 23 Motion to Compel pltf's social security administration records by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
October 22, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 33 Motion to Remand by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 7, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 39 Motion to Compel and for continuance by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 2, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Stipulated Motion of dismissal by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Townsley v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estralitta Townsley
Represented By: Scott Merrill Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alfred E Donohue
Represented By: David Lawrence Hennings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]