West v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Michael West
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00244
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS the parties' stipulation to amend the case schedule Dkt. # 36 . The Clerk is directed to enter an amended case schedule with a trial date of June 30, 2014. The Clerk is also directed to TERMINATE plaintiff's motion to reset the case schedule (Dkt. # 34 ), and to RENOTE defendant's motion for attorney's fees to February 14, 2014 (Dkt. # 32 ). (CL)
February 24, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones; The court ORDERS plaintiff's counsel to pay defendant Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC $6,936.00 in attorney's fees within 30 days of this order. (TF)
April 30, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS defendant's 47 motion for summary judgment. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: West v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael West
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]