Tefida, Zao et al v. 1,925 Cartons of Crab et al

Defendant: Alye Parusa and 1,925 Cartons of Crab
Plaintiff: Tefida, Zao and Marine Fishing International, Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00464
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Marine Contract Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 17 Motion issuance of arrest warrant by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Arrest Warrant)(RS)cc 3 cert USMO
April 15, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 18 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)cc 3 cert USMO
August 9, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Marine Treasure's motion to vacate arrest and attachment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
January 30, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Marine Treasure's 54 Motion for early trial date; trial set for 7/28/14 ; granting in part and deferred in part pltfs' 55 Motion for interlocutory sale ; JSR due within 30 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 6, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Stipulated Motion for Interlocutory Sale by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)cc USMO

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tefida, Zao et al v. 1,925 Cartons of Crab et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alye Parusa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1,925 Cartons of Crab
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tefida, Zao
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Fishing International, Inc
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]