Chandola v. Seattle Housing Authority et al

Plaintiff: Varn Chandola
Defendant: Seattle Housing Authority and James Fearn
Case Number: 2:2013cv00557
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts' 34 Motion to dismiss Equal Protection Claim in plaintiff's second amended complaint; pltf's third cause of action is dismissed with prejudice by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
September 19, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL - Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Compel Discovery DEFERRED and re-Noted for 9/25/2014, ; Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Compel Deposition Answers GRANTED in part; Defendants' 89 Motion to Strike late-filed opposition brief DENIED, Defendants' 46 Motion to Strike materials submitted GRANTED; Defendants' 66 MOTION to Compel Documents Pursuant to Subpoena DEFERRED and re-Noted for 9/25/2014, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TM)
October 7, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 37 Motion to Compel ; dfts' 66 motion to compel is denied by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
September 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 13, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MD)
August 8, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Leave to File; denying 64 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandola v. Seattle Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varn Chandola
Represented By: Jesse Andrew Wing
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Housing Authority
Represented By: Laura Hawes Young
Represented By: Kristen Dorrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fearn
Represented By: Kristen Dorrity
Represented By: Laura Hawes Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.